Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Opioid Maintenance Therapy Programs - Medical Director Requirement and Qualifications
Sponsored by
Delegate Glenn
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an opioid maintenance therapy program to have a medical director who is a physician and has 2 years of experience providing services to individuals who are addicted to alcohol or other drugs, including at least 1 year of experience in the treatment of opioid addiction with opioid maintenance therapy; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/18/2018
Legislative Date
10/18/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/18/2018 10/18/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Opioid Maintenance Therapy Programs - Medical Director Requirement and Qualifications
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM