Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Firearm Telematics - Study
Sponsored by
Delegate Queen
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/22 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Defining "firearm telematics" as an electronic sensor or equipment installed on a firearm for purposes of tracking the location of the firearm if it becomes lost or stolen; requiring the Department of State Police to study and make recommendations about firearm telematics; requiring the Department to take certain actions in conducting the study and making recommendations; and requiring the Department to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before July 1, 2021.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/10/2019
Legislative Date
9/10/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Firearm Telematics - Study
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/10/2019 9/10/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety - Firearm Telematics - Study
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/22 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/20/2020 10:05 AM