Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment – Packaging, Containers, and Paper Products – Producer Responsibility
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, Charkoudian, D. Jones, R. Lewis, Love, and Terrasa
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, by October 1, 2022, a producer of certain packaging, containers, and paper products to individually or as part of a stewardship organization submit a covered materials and products stewardship plan to the Department of the Environment for approval; prohibiting, on or after a October 1, 2024, a producer of covered materials and products from selling or distributing covered materials and products unless the producer individually or as part of a stewardship organization has an approved stewardship plan; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/15/2020
Legislative Date
10/15/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/15/2020 10/15/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Text - First - Environment – Packaging, Containers, and Paper Products – Producer Responsibility
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
(   9-2301 through 9-2308 )
Last Updated: 2/12/2021 8:07 PM
Click to return on the top page