Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Seat Belts and Child Safety Seats
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilson and Arora
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the standard for the number of seat belts required to be equipped in the front and back seats of specified motor vehicles; altering, and extending the application of, the definition of the term "seat belt"; clarifying the circumstances under which specified restraint devices may be sold; altering specified penalties for violations of specified provisions relating to the use of seat belts and child safety seats; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0340 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
10/24/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2012 10/24/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-113, 22-412, 22-412.2, 22-412.3, 27-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM