Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Surface Mining – Zone of Dewatering Influence – Remedies
Sponsored by
Delegate Wivell
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a surface mining permittee, on the discovery of a sudden subsidence of the surface of the land, to immediately implement appropriate safety measures to protect public health and safety; requiring a surface mining permittee to permanently replace a water supply within a certain zone of dewatering influence within 45 days of the date on which the permittee knew of the water supply failure; authorizing a surface mining permittee to seek reimbursement for water supply replacement costs under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0619 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/24/2018
Legislative Date
10/24/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-1)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {954832/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Surface Mining – Zone of Dewatering Influence – Remedies
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Surface Mining – Zone of Dewatering Influence – Remedies
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/24/2018 10/24/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Surface Mining - Zone of Dewatering Influence - Water Supply Replacement
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 25
Text - Third - Surface Mining - Zone of Dewatering Influence - Water Supply Replacement
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-1) 27
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 27
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable with Amendments {954832/1 Adopted 56
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Surface Mining – Zone of Dewatering Influence – Remedies
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Text - Chapter - Surface Mining – Zone of Dewatering Influence – Remedies
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-801, 15-812, 15-813 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM