Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Proceedings - Fines, Fees, and Costs
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, D.M. Davis, and Henson
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing certain provisions of law authorizing the juvenile court to impose certain civil fines against a child found to have committed certain violations; repealing a certain provision of law authorizing the juvenile court to impose certain court costs against a juvenile respondent or the respondent's parent, guardian, or custodian under certain circumstances; repealing a certain provision of law authorizing the juvenile court to assess any party or parent of a child in a certain proceeding for services of a certain attorney; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/13/2019
Legislative Date
9/13/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Proceedings - Fines, Fees, and Costs
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2020
Legislative Date
1/07/2020
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/13/2019 9/13/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Juvenile Proceedings - Fines, Fees, and Costs
House 1/07/2020 1/07/2020 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:40 AM