Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Commemorative Days - Maryland Centenarians Day
Sponsored by
Delegates Nathan-Pulliam, Pendergrass, Cullison, Elliott, Frank, Kach, A. Kelly, Morhaim, Murphy, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, Tarrant, and V. Turner
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim the second Thursday in May as Maryland Centenarians Day.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0175
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0244 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
10/24/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {606181/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2012 10/24/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable with Amendments {606181/1 Report Adopted 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 First Reading Senate Rules 68
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM