Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services Membership
Sponsored by
Delegates Clark and Buckel
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the amount of a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain qualifying volunteer fire, rescue, and emergency medical services members for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0388
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/13/2017
Legislative Date
11/13/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/13/2017 11/13/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services Membership
House 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM