Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

HB0037


CH0036

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law – Absentee Voting – References in Public Communications and Prepaid Postage for Return of Ballots
Sponsored by
Delegate Palakovich Carr
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 36
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Elections and each local board of elections to refer to absentee ballots as "mail-in" ballots and absentee voting as "mail-in voting" in all communications; requiring the State Board and each local board to include in public communications a statement that "mail-in voting" is referred to as absentee voting in the Maryland Constitution, the Annotated Code of Maryland and the Code of Maryland Regulations; making provision for absentee ballots to include prepaid return postage; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0145
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/20/2019
Legislative Date
9/20/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2020
Legislative Date
1/07/2020
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {375867/1 Adopted
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-37)
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/17 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {483120/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Kagan) (30-14) Rejected
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-33)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 36
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/20/2019 9/20/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law - References to Absentee Voting in Communications - Mail-In Voting
House 1/07/2020 1/07/2020 Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Favorable with Amendments {375867/1 Adopted 17
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 17
Text - Third - Election Law - References to Absentee Voting in Communications - Mail-In Voting
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Third Reading Passed (99-37) 18
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 19
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/17 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 50
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Floor Amendment {483120/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Kagan) (30-14) Rejected 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53C
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 House Concurs Senate Amendments 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (97-33) 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Election Law – Absentee Voting – References in Public Communications and Prepaid Postage for Return of Ballots
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 36
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:06 PM