Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses
Sponsored by
Delegate Carr
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that certain noncompete and conflict of interest provisions that restrict the ability of an employee to enter into employment with a new employer or to become self-employed in the same or similar business or trade are null and void as being against the public policy of the State; providing the Act does not apply to an employment contract or a similar document or agreement with respect to the taking or use of a client list or other proprietary client-related information; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0328
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0506 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/02/2018
Legislative Date
11/02/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2019
Legislative Date
1/16/2019
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {553899/1
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 02/15 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-39)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {247176/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {533027/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Bromwell, Charkoudian and Wilson)
Proceedings
60
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/02/2018 11/02/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses
House 1/16/2019 1/16/2019 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments {553899/1 27
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Committee Amendment Adopted 27
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Motion Special Order until 02/15 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 27
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 28
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses
House 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (97-39) 30
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Referred Finance 30
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {247176/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Floor Amendment {533027/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 59A
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (44-0) 59A
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 House Requests Senate Recede 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Bromwell, Charkoudian and Wilson) 60
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM