Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the contents of the certificate of a qualified expert to include a statement from a qualified expert that the licensed professional failed to meet an applicable standard of professional care and supervision; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0386
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0345 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2015
Legislative Date
1/15/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-3)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2015 1/15/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/11 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 30
House 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Second Reading Passed 30
House 2/26/2015 2/26/2015 Third Reading Passed (126-3) 32
Senate 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 32
Senate 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM