Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Funding Ratio Report - Market Value of Assets
Sponsored by
Delegate McConkey
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to submit a report on or before December 1 each year to the Joint Committee on Pensions and the General Assembly on the funding ratio of the State Retirement and Pension System based on the market value of the assets.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/14/2016
Legislative Date
11/14/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/14/2016 11/14/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - Funding Ratio Report - Market Value of Assets
House 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM