Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron and Henson
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering certain provisions relating to the admission in evidence, during certain criminal trials, of a statement offered against a party who wrongfully caused or acquiesced in wrongfully causing the unavailability of the declarant of the statement; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0064
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2019
Legislative Date
11/01/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2019 11/01/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:40 AM