Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Energy Administration Study on Geothermal Heating and Cooling Systems and Geothermal Energy Workgroup
Sponsored by
Delegate Charkoudian
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Energy Administration to conduct a comprehensive technical study on geothermal heating and cooling systems; requiring the Administration to submit the results to the Geothermal Energy Workgroup by October 1, 2021; establishing the Workgroup to study the impact of an increase in the use of geothermal energy, examine ways to expand geothermal energy in the State, and study the impact of the industry on jobs; requiring the Administration to develop recommendations for an incentive structure; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2021
Legislative Date
1/12/2021
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Maryland Energy Administration Study on Geothermal Heating and Cooling Systems and Geothermal Energy Workgroup
House 1/12/2021 1/12/2021 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/22/2021 10:21 AM