Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Indian Status - Standards for Recognition
Sponsored by
Delegates Murphy and Branch
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Specifying that the special circumstances that must be taken into account by specified standards for recognition of Maryland Indian status established by the Commission on Indian Affairs by regulation must include circumstances created by State law; altering the criteria that are required to be included in the standards; stating that the Act may not be construed to affect any rights or requirements regarding Indian tribe property or gaming under the federal Indian Gaming Regulatory Act or any other federal law; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0691 Session: 2009 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
10/29/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {816787/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 10/29/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/08/2014 1/08/2014 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/10/2014 2/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments {816787/1 Report Adopted 27
House 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 30
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 29
Senate 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page