Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 1 Distillery Licenses
Sponsored by
Delegate Barkley
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 314
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing the holder of a Class 1 distillery license to establish and operate a plant for distilling, rectifying, blending, and bottling specified alcoholic beverages at the location described in the license; allowing the license holder to acquire alcoholic beverages from a holder of any manufacturer's license, wholesaler's license, or a holder of a nonresident dealer's permit; authorizing the license holder to serve at no cost or for a fee specified product samples to specified individuals who have participated in a guided tour; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0616 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
6/14/2016
Legislative Date
6/14/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 1 Distillery Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 1 Distillery Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 314
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 1 Distillery Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 6/14/2016 6/14/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 1 Distillery Licenses
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 1 Distillery Licenses
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 42
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 41
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 55
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 314
Text - Chapter - Alcoholic Beverages - Class 1 Distillery Licenses
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM