Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Harassment - Revenge Porn
Sponsored by
Delegates Simmons, Cardin, Frick, Afzali, Arora, Barkley, Cullison, DeBoy, Dwyer, Frush, George, Glenn, Gutierrez, Healey, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Lafferty, McComas, McDonough, Murphy, Niemann, Olszewski, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, Rudolph, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, Stukes, F. Turner, Weir, McDermott, Arentz, Aumann, Boteler, Cluster, Eckardt, Elliott, Frank, K. Kelly, Krebs, Otto, Parrott, Smigiel, Swain, Valentino-Smith, and Vitale
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from intentionally causing serious emotional distress to another by intentionally placing on the Internet a specified reproduction of the image of the other person knowing that the other person did not consent to the placement of the image on the Internet under specified circumstances; providing that a specified interactive computer service is not liable under the Act for content provided by another person; establishing penalties for a violation of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
10/29/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/2014
Legislative Date
1/01/2014
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {692615/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/28 (Delegate Dumais) Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {598674/1
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Special Order until 4/7 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {598674/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {423220/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 10/29/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/01/2014 1/01/2014 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2014 2/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments {692615/1 Report Adopted 35
House 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
House 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Motion Special Order until 2/28 (Delegate Dumais) Adopted 37
House 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 38
Senate 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 37
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments {598674/1 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Special Order until 4/7 Adopted 60
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments {598674/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {423220/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 63
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 69
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 69
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Passed Enrolled 69
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-809 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM