Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure – Plea Agreement Terms and the Violence Prevention Initiative Criteria
Sponsored by
Delegate Metzgar
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that, if a court accepts a certain plea agreement with a certain sentence for a defendant charged with committing a crime of violence, the defendant shall serve the sentence imposed without reduction by diminution credits or parole, or otherwise; providing that a court or review panel may not modify a sentence imposed under a plea agreement in accordance with the Act; and providing that the Act only applies to the sentencing of a defendant for a certain crime of violence.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1320 Session: 2011 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/31/2019
Legislative Date
10/31/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/31/2019 10/31/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure – Plea Agreement Terms and the Violence Prevention Initiative Criteria
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:32 PM