Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability Company
Sponsored by
Delegate A. Miller
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting a transfer of real property from a sole proprietorship to a limited liability company from recordation and transfer taxes if the sole member of the limited liability company is identical to the converting sole proprietor and specified other conditions are met.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
10/27/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2016
Legislative Date
1/07/2016
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2016
Legislative Date
1/18/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 10/27/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/07/2016 1/07/2016 Hearing 1/20 at 2:00 p.m.
House 1/18/2016 1/18/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 50
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed 50
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 51
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 49
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-108, 13-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM