Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland - Extension and Alteration
Sponsored by
Delegates Krebs and M. Jackson (By Request - Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland)
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland to report certain findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 15, 2020, and on or before December 15, 2021; and extending the termination date for the Commission by 2 years to June 30, 2022.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0047
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/28/2019
Legislative Date
8/28/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/28/2019 8/28/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland - Extension and Alteration
House 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:40 AM