Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsored by
Delegates McMillan, Beidle, Cane, Frush, Glenn, Hogan, Holmes, Jacobs, Norman, O'Donnell, Otto, Stein, Vitale, Weir, and Wilson
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Changing the interest rate paid on a security deposit at the end of a tenancy under a residential lease when an evicted or ejected tenant makes a timely written demand for return of the security deposit; altering the annual interest rate paid by a mobile home park owner on a security deposit at the end of a tenancy; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to maintain on its Web site a specified list or calculator; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0337
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0022 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
11/08/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {640514/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-2)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
35
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2012 11/08/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/22/2013 2/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Favorable with Amendments {640514/1 Report Adopted 35
House 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
House 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Third Reading Passed (130-2) 37
Senate 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 35
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-203, 8A-1001 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM