Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Baltimore County Public Library - Collective Bargaining
Sponsored by
Delegate Forbes
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing employees of the Baltimore County Public Library to form, join, and participate in an employee organization and engage in certain other activities related to collective bargaining; specifying the responsibilities of the library and the certified exclusive representative; requiring the library to recognize certain rights of the certified exclusive representative; requiring the certified exclusive representative to represent employees in a certain manner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0138
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/29/2020
Legislative Date
10/29/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Baltimore County Public Library - Collective Bargaining
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2021
Legislative Date
1/11/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Appropriations
House 10/29/2020 10/29/2020 Pre-filed
Text - First - Education - Baltimore County Public Library - Collective Bargaining
House 1/11/2021 1/11/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-701 through 23-709 )
Last Updated: 1/14/2021 1:10 PM