Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - 40th and 41st Legislative Districts - Alcoholic Beverages - Store Closing Hours
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Robinson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Setting 10 p.m. as the time at which establishments issued specified Class A alcoholic beverages licenses in the 40th and 41st Legislative Districts in Baltimore City must stop selling alcoholic beverages.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0225
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
11/13/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2012 11/13/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-302, 11-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM