Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Sponsored by
Delegate Arora
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an official publisher that publishes legal material in an electronic record to designate the electronic record as official, under specified circumstances, and authenticate the electronic record in a specified manner; providing that specified legal material in an electronic record is presumed to be an accurate copy of the legal material; requiring an official publisher of specified legal material in an electronic record to provide for the preservation and security of the record; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0275
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
10/22/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2014
Legislative Date
1/10/2014
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 10/22/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/10/2014 1/10/2014 Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2014 2/18/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-1401 through 10-1411 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM