Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Animal Control Units - Impounded Animals - Identification
Sponsored by
Delegate Chang
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a specified animal control unit from selling, placing or destroying a specified impounded animal until the animal has been carefully inspected for a microchip; requiring a specified animal control unit to make a reasonable effort to notify the owner of the location of and procedure for retrieving an impounded animal; and providing specified penalties.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
10/23/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {920910/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 10/23/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Favorable with Amendments {920910/1 Report Adopted 45
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 46
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Second Reading Passed 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-617 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM