Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing Hearings
Sponsored by
Delegate Conaway
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating an exception in Baltimore City to the general prohibition against recording or broadcasting a criminal sentencing hearing; establishing requirements that a media organization file a specified written request to provide media coverage of a criminal sentencing hearing with the clerk of the court at least 24 hours before the hearing is scheduled to begin; requiring the clerk of the court to provide notice of the request to each party involved in the criminal proceeding; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
6/24/2016
Legislative Date
6/24/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 6/24/2016 6/24/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Baltimore City - Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing Hearings
House 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM