Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Small Business Relief Tax Credit - Expansion
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Anderton, Arentz, Cassilly, Chisholm, Ciliberti, Corderman, Cox, Ghrist, Hartman, Hornberger, Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, Metzgar, Otto, Pippy, Reilly, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "qualified employee" to include certain individuals who are provided certain paid parental leave for purposes of a credit against the State income tax for certain small businesses that provide certain employer benefits to certain qualified employees; altering the calculation of the credit; increasing, from $5,000,000 to $10,000,000, the total amount of tax credit certificates that may be issued by the Department of Commerce for each taxable year; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0089
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2019
Legislative Date
1/11/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Small Business Relief Tax Credit - Expansion
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/11/2019 1/11/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Small Business Relief Tax Credit - Expansion
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-748 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM