Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Special Education - Loan Assistance Repayment and Paraprofessional Training
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Smith, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of Student Financial Assistance of the Maryland Higher Education Commission to assist in the repayment of a higher education loan owed by a special education teacher who has taught in the State of Maryland for at least 2 years and meets other specified qualifications; requiring the Office of Student Financial Assistance to adopt regulations that establish priority for participation in the Janet L. Hoffman Loan Assistance Repayment Program for an individual who is employed in a specified position; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/19/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2015 1/19/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-1502, 18-1503 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM