Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer, Wine, and Liquor and Class 9 Limited Distillery Licenses
Sponsored by
Delegate Arentz
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing in Queen Anne's County a holder of a Class D beer, wine, and liquor license and a Class 9 limited distillery license to sell liquor distilled at the location for off-premises consumption; prohibiting the holder of a Class D beer, wine, and liquor license and a Class 9 limited distillery license from selling beer for off-premises consumption; and providing an annual license fee of $1800.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0820
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/27/2016
Legislative Date
7/27/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {113891/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/27/2016 7/27/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer, Wine, and Liquor and Class 9 Limited Distillery Licenses
House 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {113891/1 Adopted 40
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer, Wine, and Liquor and Class 9 Limited Distillery Licenses
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 42
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 41
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Text - Chapter - Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer, Wine, and Liquor and Class 9 Limited Distillery Licenses
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   27-102, 27-906 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM