Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems Licenses – Modifications
Sponsored by
Delegate Jameson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the holder of an electronic nicotine delivery systems retailer license to make sales to consumers through the mail, a computer network, a telephonic network, or another electronic network; authorizing the holder of an electronic nicotine delivery systems wholesaler distributor license or an electronic nicotine delivery systems wholesaler importer license to sell electronic nicotine delivery systems to vape shop vendors; authorizing licensed vape shop vendors to make certain purchases from certain distributors; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0090
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/06/2017
Legislative Date
11/06/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {493998/1 Adopted
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems Licenses – Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2018
Legislative Date
2/13/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems Licenses – Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/06/2017 11/06/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems Retailer License - Sales Through Mail or Electronic Network
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Favorable with Amendments {493998/1 Adopted 22
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 22
Text - Third - Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems Licenses – Modifications
House 2/13/2018 2/13/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 25
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Referred Finance 26
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 55
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Text - Chapter - Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems Licenses – Modifications
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM