Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - Maryland School-Based Health Center Standards - Revision
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison, Pendergrass, Pena-Melnyk, Bagnall, Barron, Bhandari, Carr, Charles, Chisholm, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, R. Lewis, Metzgar, Morgan, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education and the Maryland Department of Health to revise no later than August 1, 2019, the Maryland School-Based Health Center Standards to repeal the requirements that a school-based health center have a medical director who is a physician and have a physician consultant who is available to discuss clinical issues as needed and to authorize a licensed physician or nurse practitioner to serve as a clinical director or clinical consultant of a school-based health center.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0404
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1800 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2019
Legislative Date
1/11/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {856481/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed 47-0
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/11/2019 1/11/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - Maryland School-Based Health Center Standards - Revision
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {856481/1 Adopted 31
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Text - Third - State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - Maryland School-Based Health Center Standards - Revision
House 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 33
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Referred Finance 33
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed 47-0 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Text - Chapter - State Department of Education and Maryland Department of Health - Maryland School-Based Health Center Standards - Revision
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM