Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Qualification License - Training Exemption
Sponsored by
Delegates Parrott, Miller, Hartman, Cox, Arikan, Reilly, and Corderman
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/22 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting an applicant who is a law enforcement officer with a law enforcement agency in Delaware, Pennsylvania, Virginia, West Virginia, or Washington, D.C. from the firearms safety training course requirement for a handgun qualification license.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/22/2019
Legislative Date
8/22/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Handgun Qualification License - Training Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/22/2019 8/22/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety - Handgun Qualification License - Training Exemption
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/22 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:40 AM