Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Minority Business Enterprises - Not-for-Profit Entities
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Robinson, Hammen, Donoghue, Elliott, A. Kelly, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reznik, and V. Turner
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified entities to include in specified contracts a requirement for procuring janitorial products; excluding a not-for-profit entity organized to promote the interests of physically or mentally disabled individuals from a specified definition of minority business enterprise; prohibiting specified contracts from being counted as part of a unit of State government's total dollar value of procurement contracts; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1066
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0029 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013, July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
11/13/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/04/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {486088/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {874934/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (30-14)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2012 11/13/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/04/2013 2/04/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2013 3/23/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {486088/1 Report Adopted 53
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 54
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 52
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable with Amendments {874934/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (30-14) 63
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 House Concur - Senate Amendments 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Passed Enrolled 66
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-101 through 14-103, 14-110, 14-301, 14-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM