Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Wireless Landline Telephone Service - Prohibition and Study
Sponsored by
Delegate A. Kelly
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting specified telephone companies from replacing a landline or wireline telephone service with a wireless telephone service, subject to specified exceptions; prohibiting the Public Service Commission from authorizing specified telephone companies to replace a landline or wireline telephone service with a wireless telephone service, subject to specified exceptions; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
8/14/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 8/14/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM