Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Shielding - Nolle Prosequi
Sponsored by
Delegate Conaway
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the District Court of Maryland to shield specified records from public access within 60 days following an entry of nolle prosequi by the State in a criminal court proceeding under specified circumstances; authorizing the State's Attorney to object to the shielding of specified records by filing an objection within a specified time period; requiring the court to schedule a hearing under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/13/2016
Legislative Date
10/13/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Shielding - Nolle Prosequi
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/13/2016 10/13/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Shielding - Nolle Prosequi
House 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 Hearing canceled
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM