Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics - Confidentiality of Activities - Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegate Cluster
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that certain provisions of law relating to the authority of public bodies to meet in closed session do not apply to the Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics; providing that the requirement that an advisory body delete certain information before an advisory opinion can be made public does not apply to the Joint Committee; repealing certain provisions of law requiring that certain matters before the Joint Committee remain confidential except under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/02/2017
Legislative Date
11/02/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/02/2017 11/02/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics - Confidentiality of Activities - Repeal
House 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-206, 3-305, 3-306, 5-301, 5-303, 5-515, 5-517, 5-518 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM