Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Petitions - Confidentiality
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Robinson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a sponsor or circulator of a petition from disclosing to the public specified information that an individual includes on a petition; prohibiting public inspection of a petition after the petition is filed with the State Board of Elections or a county board of elections, subject to an exception; requiring a custodian to permit a person to inspect a petition if the person requires access to the petition to facilitate judicial review of a determination concerning the sufficiency of the petition; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
11/13/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2013
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2013
Legislative Date
1/15/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2012 11/13/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/09/2013 1/09/2013 Hearing 1/16 at 11:00 a.m.
House 1/15/2013 1/15/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/19/2013 2/20/2013 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-101, 6-203, 6-205 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM