Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Pretrial Risk Assessment Instruments
Sponsored by
Delegate Palakovich Carr
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a jurisdiction that uses a pretrial risk assessment instrument to aid in determining the eligibility for pretrial release of an individual charged with a crime to have an independent validation study of the instrument conducted at least once every 3 years; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0068
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/22/2019
Legislative Date
8/22/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judiciary
House 8/22/2019 8/22/2019 Pre-filed
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Pretrial Risk Assessment Instruments
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:40 AM