Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hate Crimes - Prohibitions and Protected Classes - Expansion to Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsored by
Delegate Arentz
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Including law enforcement officers and first responders within the scope of specified prohibitions against committing crimes against specified persons, damaging property of specified persons, and burning objects and damaging specified buildings in circumstances exhibiting animosity against persons or groups due to race, color, religious beliefs, sexual orientation, gender, disability, national origin, or status as homeless.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
9/02/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 9/02/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-301, 10-304, 10-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM