Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Use of Electronic Control Devices - Reports
Sponsored by
Delegate Conaway
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a law enforcement agency that issues electronic control devices (ECDs) to its law enforcement officers to report annually on or before March 31 to the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention information for each time a law enforcement officer discharges an ECD except during training, using a specified format; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to analyze and summarize reports and to submit an annual report to the Governor, the General Assembly, and each law enforcement agency; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0507 Session: 2011 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/07/2016
Legislative Date
9/07/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Use of Electronic Control Devices - Reports
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/07/2016 9/07/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety - Use of Electronic Control Devices - Reports
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM