Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plate - United States Armed Forces
Sponsored by
Delegate Smigiel
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to develop and make available for specified vehicles a registration plate honoring the armed forces of the United States; requiring that fees charged for the plates be used only for specified purposes; requiring a registration plate issued under the Act to contain a specified graphic design and specified words; requiring the Administration to adopt regulations to carry out the provisions of the Act; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0541 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
10/25/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2012 10/25/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-619.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM