Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Boards of Education - Bullying Hotlines and Tip Boxes
Sponsored by
Delegate Cardin
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring county boards of education to establish a toll-free bullying hotline and distribute bullying tip boxes to public schools; requiring county boards of education to publicize the bullying hotline and tip boxes in specified locations and venues; requiring the completion of a victim of bullying, harassment, or intimidation report form on receipt of a report of an act of bullying, harassment, or intimidation on a bullying hotline or from a tip box; establishing that specified information is confidential; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
6/05/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 6/05/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/16/2014 1/16/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-424, 7-424.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM