Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Individuals Released From Correctional Facilities - Voter Registration
Sponsored by
Delegate Bartlett
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a correctional facility to provide an inmate who has completed a sentence of imprisonment for a felony conviction with a voter registration form before releasing the inmate; requiring a correctional facility to inform the inmate that the inmate will have the right to vote after the inmate's release from the correctional facility, and that the inmate must register to vote after the inmate's release in order to exercise the right to vote; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0091
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/28/2019
Legislative Date
8/28/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2020
Legislative Date
1/07/2020
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/28/2019 8/28/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law - Individuals Released From Correctional Facilities - Voter Registration
House 1/07/2020 1/07/2020 Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:40 AM