Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization, Pregnancy, and Childbirth Services - Surrogate Benefits
Sponsored by
Delegate Wivell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations from excluding benefits for expenses related to in vitro fertilization procedures performed on a specified surrogate; requiring insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations that provide benefits for pregnancy and childbirth to provide the benefits to a specified surrogate; applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed on or before January 1, 2017; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
10/27/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 10/27/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2016 2/16/2016 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-810, 15-850 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM