Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Foster Youth Legislative Shadow Days
Sponsored by
Delegate Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim the second Wednesday and Thursday in February as Foster Youth Legislative Shadow Days.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2017
Legislative Date
11/01/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2017 11/01/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Foster Youth Legislative Shadow Days
House 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-402, 7-402 through 7-417 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM