Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Contraceptive Devices - Minors
Sponsored by
Delegates Parrott, Hartman, Arikan, and Metzgar
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a certain health care provider from inserting or implanting a contraceptive device, including an intrauterine device or implantable rod, into the body of a minor unless the minor's parent or guardian provides written authorization for the minor to have the device inserted or implanted.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/15/2019
Legislative Date
10/15/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Contraceptive Devices - Minors
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/15/2019 10/15/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Contraceptive Devices - Minors
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-103.1 )
Last Updated: 6/16/2020 4:05 PM