Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Voting Rights - Imprisoned Felons
Sponsored by
Delegates Ivey, Acevero, Belcastro, Brooks, Crutchfield, and Henson
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which an individual is not qualified to be a registered voter for the purpose of allowing individuals convicted of a felony and serving a court-ordered sentence of imprisonment for the conviction to register to vote; repealing a requirement that certain officials of the circuit court and the District Courts report certain information to the State Administrator of Elections regarding individuals convicted of a felony; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/24/2020
Legislative Date
10/24/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Voting Rights - Imprisoned Felons
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/24/2020 10/24/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Text - First - Election Law - Voting Rights - Imprisoned Felons
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/11/2021 4:45 PM