Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Naming Rights for Rest Areas and Welcome Centers
Sponsored by
Delegate Lam
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Highway Administration to sell or lease to a private entity the naming rights for rest areas and welcome centers, as specified; prohibiting the sale or lease of rest area and welcome center naming rights unless the Administration makes certain determinations; requiring the term of a contract for the sale or lease of naming rights to be at least 1 year; requiring the proceeds from the sale or lease of naming rights for rest areas and welcome centers to be credited to the Transportation Trust Fund; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0024
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/05/2017
Legislative Date
10/05/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-11)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2018
Legislative Date
5/25/2018
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/05/2017 10/05/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Naming Rights for Rest Areas and Welcome Centers
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Naming Rights for Rest Areas and Welcome Centers
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (33-11) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Returned Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2018 5/25/2018 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
(   8-204, 8-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page