Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Lands Formed by Excavation Materials - Transfer of Authority
Sponsored by
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Natural Resources)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Transferring the use, management, and, subject to Board of Public Works approval, ownership of certain lands created or formed by excavation materials in Sinepuxent, Isle of Wight, and Chincoteague bays from the Department of the Environment to the Department of Natural Resources; and repealing certain approval authority of the Board over the use and management of certain lands created or formed by excavation materials in Sinepuxent, Isle of Wight, and Chincoteague bays.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2019
Legislative Date
1/14/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/14/2019 1/14/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Natural Resources - Lands Formed by Excavation Materials - Transfer of Authority
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing canceled
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-401 through 16-403 )
(   5-10A-02, 5-10A-03 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM