Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Renewal - Late Fee
Sponsored by
Delegates Carr and Moon
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to charge a late fee not exceeding $25 for registration renewals that occur more than 1 week after a registration has expired.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/15/2019
Legislative Date
10/15/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Registration Renewal - Late Fee
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/15/2019 10/15/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Registration Renewal - Late Fee
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-910 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:40 AM